HI HCR79 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR79
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting An Increased Presence By The Honolulu Police Department In The Chinatown And Downtown Honolulu Areas.
Title
Requesting An Increased Presence By The Honolulu Police Department In The Chinatown And Downtown Honolulu Areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-23-17 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2017-03-07 | House | Offered |
2017-03-06 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR79 (Carry Over) 2017-03-23 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HR44 (Same As) 2017-03-23 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HR44 (Same As) 2017-03-23 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=79&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HCR79_.HTM |