HI HCR8 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-17 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ching voting no and Representative(s) M. Oshiro excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-17 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ching voting no and Representative(s) M. Oshiro excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging That Portraits Of Officials Of The Provisional Government Of Hawai`i Be Removed From Display In Positions Of Honor In State Government Buildings.
Title
OHA; State Government Buildings; Remove Provisional Govt. Officials Portraits
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-17 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ching voting no and Representative(s) M. Oshiro excused. | |
2010-02-17 | (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 421-10), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-10 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Shimabukuro, Bertram, Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Brower, Nishimoto, Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane. | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 02-10-10 10:00am in conference room 329. | |
2010-01-29 | (H) Referred to HAW, FIN, referral sheet 11 | |
2010-01-28 | (H) Offered | |
2010-01-19 | (H) To be offered. |