HI HCR8 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to TIA/PSM/THA.
Pending: Senate Transportation and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to TIA/PSM/THA.
Pending: Senate Transportation and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Department Of State, The Department Of Homeland Security, And The United States Attorney General To Ease Visa Restrictions For The Peoples Republic Of China.
Title
HSAC Package; People's Republic of China; Visa Waiver
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | Senate | Referred to TIA/PSM/THA. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 651). |
2013-04-12 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-12 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, McDermott, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). |
2013-04-12 | House | Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1639) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2013-04-08 | House | The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Cachola, Choy, Takayama, Tokioka, Tsuji, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno, Onishi. |
2013-04-05 | House | Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by TOU on Monday, 04-08-13 8:30AM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-03 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TOU on Monday, 04-08-13 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on TOU with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Ito, C. Lee, Tokioka excused (4). |
2013-03-28 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1243), recommending referral to TOU. |
2013-03-20 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-19 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2013-03-14 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 03-20-13 8:30AM in conference room 312. |
2013-02-01 | House | Referred to VMI, TOU, referral sheet 12 |
2013-01-18 | House | Offered |
2013-01-18 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR22 (Same As) 2013-04-12 - Resolution adopted in final form.