HI HCR8 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday, 04-01-15 2:30PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday, 04-01-15 2:30PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting A Sunrise Analysis Of Dental Therapists.
Title
Sunrise Analysis; Dental Therapists
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday, 04-01-15 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-30 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 04-01-15 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-20 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, LoPresti, Luke, Oshiro, Saiki, Thielen excused (6). |
2015-03-20 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 994), recommending referral to CPC. |
2015-03-13 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kobayashi; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro, Tupola. |
2015-03-11 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-13-15 11:30AM in conference room 329. |
2015-03-11 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-13-15 at 11:30am. |
2015-03-09 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-11-15 9:00AM in conference room 329. |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 7 |
2015-01-23 | House | Offered |
2015-01-22 | House | To be offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=8&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HCR8_.HTM |