HI HCR8 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR8
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Har, Hashem, Lowen, McDermott, Nakashima, Souki excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Har, Hashem, Lowen, McDermott, Nakashima, Souki excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approving The Sale Of The Leased Fee Interest In 41-1373 Haunaukoi Street, Waimanalo, Hawaii.
Title
Approving The Sale Of The Leased Fee Interest In 41-1373 Haunaukoi Street, Waimanalo, Hawaii.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Har, Hashem, Lowen, McDermott, Nakashima, Souki excused (7). |
2018-03-15 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1151-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Hashem, Quinlan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, San Buenaventura, McDermott. |
2018-02-09 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-13-18 10:15AM in conference room 423. |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 18 |
2018-01-24 | House | Offered |
2018-01-22 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR15 (Same As) 2018-04-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR8 (Carry Over) 2017-02-07 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 14
HCR8 (Carry Over) 2017-02-07 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 14
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=8&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HCR8_.HTM |