HI HCR8 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR8
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to EDU.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to EDU.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Board Of Education And Department Of Education To Elevate Hawaiian Language And Cultural Education In Public High Schools By Expanding Access To Hawaiian Language And Cultural Classes That Fulfill Core Requirements Throughout Secondary Education.
Title
Urging The Board Of Education And Department Of Education To Elevate Hawaiian Language And Cultural Education In Public High Schools By Expanding Access To Hawaiian Language And Cultural Classes That Fulfill Core Requirements Throughout Secondary Education.
Sponsors
Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] |
Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Adrian Tam [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 333). |
2021-03-31 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-31 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ohno excused (2). |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1616) as amended in HD 2, recommending adoption. |
2021-03-29 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Nakamura. |
2021-03-25 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Monday, 03-29-21 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-19 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2021-03-19 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1117) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JHA. |
2021-03-11 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, DeCoite, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Ohno, Quinlan, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane. |
2021-03-09 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 03-11-21 2:00PM in conference room 309 & 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to EDN, JHA, referral sheet 15 |
2021-01-25 | House | Offered |
2021-01-22 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR8 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to EDU.
HR9 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR9 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.