HI HCR8 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR8
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-29 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 930).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-29 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 930).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Display Of The Prisoner Of War And Missing In Action Flag At The State Capitol.
Title
Requesting The Display Of The Prisoner Of War And Missing In Action Flag At The State Capitol.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Corrections, Military, & Veterans: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Corrections, Military, & Veterans: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-29 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 930). |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-28-22. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Reported from PSM/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 4066) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Fevella. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 04-20-22 1:20PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Referred to PSM/GVO. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 413). |
2022-04-07 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-07 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Nishimoto excused (3). |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1697-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2022-04-05 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi. |
2022-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 04-05-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Woodson, Yamane excused (4). |
2022-03-29 | House | Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1479-22), recommending referral to JHA. |
2022-03-23 | House | The committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kong, McDermott. |
2022-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 03-23-22 10:30AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-04 | House | Referred to CMV, JHA, referral sheet 9 |
2022-02-01 | House | Offered |
2022-01-31 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR5 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR8 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to EDU.
HCR8 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to EDU.