HI HCR81 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR81
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Budget And Finance To Study The Per-pupil Funding System For Public Charter Schools To Determine Whether The System Ensures Equitable Funding Among All Public Schools And Whether An Alternative System May Achieve Greater Funding Parity And Financial And Long-term Operational Sustainability For Public Charter Schools.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Budget And Finance To Study The Per-pupil Funding System For Public Charter Schools To Determine Whether The System Ensures Equitable Funding Among All Public Schools And Whether An Alternative System May Achieve Greater Funding Parity And Financial And Long-term Operational Sustainability For Public Charter Schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4). |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1500) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-03-22 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Har, Creagan, Hashem, Ohno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, McKelvey. |
2017-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-22-17 3:00PM in conference room 309. |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 29 |
2017-03-09 | House | Offered |
2017-03-07 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR81 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).