HI HCR84 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR84
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to WTL/WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to WTL/WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting An Audit Of Various Funds And Programs Of The Department Of Land And Natural Resources.
Title
Requesting An Audit Of Various Funds And Programs Of The Department Of Land And Natural Resources.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Referred to WTL/WAM. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 480). |
2018-04-05 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-05 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Choy, Holt, C. Lee, LoPresti, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (6). |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1846-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2018-04-04 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Cullen, Kong; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McKelvey. |
2018-04-02 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 04-04-18 11:20AM in conference room 325. |
2018-03-28 | House | Re-referred to WAL, referral sheet 49 |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-08 | House | Offered |
2018-03-08 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR69 (Same As) 2018-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR84 (Carry Over) 2017-03-13 - Referred to AGR/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 29
HCR84 (Carry Over) 2017-03-13 - Referred to AGR/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 29