HI HCR90 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR90
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Public Utilities Commission To Protect The Public Interest When Reviewing The Potential Acquisition Of Hawaii Gas By An External Entity.
Title
Requesting The Public Utilities Commission To Protect The Public Interest When Reviewing The Potential Acquisition Of Hawaii Gas By An External Entity.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] |
Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] | Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-05 | House | Offered |
2020-03-04 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR71 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325.
HCR90 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 33
HCR90 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=90&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR90_.HTM |