HI HCR93 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The State And County To Require That The Design And Construction Of Public Buildings, Facilities, And Sites Meet Or Exceed The Leadership In Energy And Environmental Design Silver Or Two Green Globes Rating System.
Title
State Buildings; County Buildings; Leadership in Energy and Environmental Design; Green Certification
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-03-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-19-15 8:30AM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2015-03-12 | House | Offered |
2015-03-11 | House | To be offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=93&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HCR93_.HTM |