HI HCR96 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR96
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Expand Transportation Services In The Pearl City School District.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Education To Expand Transportation Services In The Pearl City School District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR90 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 27
HCR96 (Carry Over) 2021-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR23 (Same As) 2022-03-21 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
HCR96 (Carry Over) 2021-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR23 (Same As) 2022-03-21 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=96&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HCR96_.HTM |