HI HR10 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Ching, C. Lee, Mizuno, Morita, M. Oshiro, Saiki, Souki, Takumi, Thielen excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Ching, C. Lee, Mizuno, Morita, M. Oshiro, Saiki, Souki, Takumi, Thielen excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Governor To Preserve The Counties' Share Of The Transient Accommodations Tax.
Title
Preserve the Counties' Share of TAT
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Ching, C. Lee, Mizuno, Morita, M. Oshiro, Saiki, Souki, Takumi, Thielen excused. | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 609), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-14 | (H) The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Tokioka, Awana, Choy, Evans, Hashem, McKelvey, Nishimoto, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ching. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by TOU on Monday, 02-14-11 10:20AM in conference room 312. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 5 | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Offered | |
2011-01-27 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR8 (Same As) 2011-03-03 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Ching, C. Lee, Mizuno, Morita, M. Oshiro, Saiki, Souki, Takumi, Thielen excused.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=10 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HR10_.HTM |