HI HR105 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The National Agricultural Statistics Service To Use Green Coffee, Instead Of Parchment Equivalent, As The Basis For Valuing Hawaii's Coffee Crops.
Title
Coffee; Valuation; National Agricultural Statistics Service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, Manahan, Wooley excused (4). | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Reported from AGR/ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1402-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Brower, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Pine. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Hashem, Awana, Brower, Choy, Evans, McKelvey, Nishimoto, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR/ERB on Wednesday, 03-21-12 9:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) Referred to AGR/ERB, referral sheet 47 | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Offered | |
2012-03-13 | (H) To be offered. |