HI HR105 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Department Of Health To Establish An Emergency Services Patient Advocate Program To Provide Assistance To And Advocate On Behalf Of Patients Receiving Emergency Medical Care.
Title
Emergency Services Patient Advocate Program; Establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll excused (1). |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1338), recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll. |
2013-03-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-27-13 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR135 (Same As) 2013-04-02 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll excused (1).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=105&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HR105_.HTM |