HI HR105 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR105
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Health To Request Acknowledgment From The Drug Enforcement Administration That Hawaii's Medical Cannabis Program Is Exempt From Federal Controlled Substance Regulations.
Title
Urging The Department Of Health To Request Acknowledgment From The Drug Enforcement Administration That Hawaii's Medical Cannabis Program Is Exempt From Federal Controlled Substance Regulations.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-06 | House | Offered |
2020-03-05 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR126 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 40
HR105 (Carry Over) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR105 (Carry Over) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=105&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HR105_.HTM |