HI HR108 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR108
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Governor To Appoint A Creative Resurgence Coordinator To The Governor's Cabinet.
Title
Urging The Governor To Appoint A Creative Resurgence Coordinator To The Governor's Cabinet.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4). |
2022-03-31 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1602-22), recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-03-30 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Okimoto. |
2022-03-24 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 03-30-22 10:00AM in conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR112 (Same As) 2022-03-31 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).
HR108 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Referred to JHA, LAT, referral sheet 25
HR108 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Referred to JHA, LAT, referral sheet 25