HI HR112 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Malama Koloa For Receiving A Designation Of Holo Holo Koloa As A State Scenic Byway And Supporting The Scenic Byway Corridor Management Plan For Holo Holo Koloa.
Title
Holo Holo Koloa
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, Manahan, Wooley excused (4). | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1397-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-03-28 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cullen, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Takumi, Yamashita. | |
2012-03-22 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-28-12 10:30AM in conference room 309. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Referred to TRN, referral sheet 50 | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Offered |