HI HR112 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing A Task Force Within The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Examine The Potential Benefits Of Creating Twenty-four Hour Marketplaces Across The State.
Title
Twenty-Four Hour Marketplaces; Tourism
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-23 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1752), recommending adoption. |
2013-04-18 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Brower, Cachola, Evans, Ito, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 7 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, Har, C. Lee, McDermott. |
2013-04-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 04-18-13 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-11 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Oshiro excused (2). |
2013-04-11 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1635), recommending referral to CPC. |
2013-04-02 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Brower, Cachola, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Choy. |
2013-03-28 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 04-02-13 10:30AM in conference room 312. |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to EDB, CPC, referral sheet 39 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=112&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HR112_.HTM |