HI HR112 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting Collaborative Efforts For Stewardship And Preservation Of Waipio Valley.
Title
Waipio Valley; Collaborative Stewardship; Preservation
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2016-04-07 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4). |
2016-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1543-16), recommending adoption. |
2016-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-05 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-04-01 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:00PM in conference room 308. |
2016-03-24 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from WAL/OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1327-16), recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-03-21 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Pouha. |
2016-03-21 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Pouha. |
2016-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Monday, 03-21-16 11:00AM in conference room 325. |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to WAL/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2016-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR162 (Same As) 2016-04-28 - Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 663).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=112&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HR112_.HTM |