HI HR112 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR112
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Submit A Request To The Drug Enforcement Administration For An Exception To Regulations And A Petition To Initiate Proceedings For Federal Rulemaking To Clarify That The State-authorized Use Of Medical Cannabis Does Not Violate The Federal Controlled Substances Act.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Health To Submit A Request To The Drug Enforcement Administration For An Exception To Regulations And A Petition To Initiate Proceedings For Federal Rulemaking To Clarify That The State-authorized Use Of Medical Cannabis Does Not Violate The Federal Controlled Substances Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2021-03-31 | House | Adopted with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ohno excused (2). |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1617), recommending adoption. |
2021-03-29 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Nakamura. |
2021-03-25 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Monday, 03-29-21 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1288) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JHA. |
2021-03-23 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2021-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-23-21 9:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 25 |
2021-03-12 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR112 (Carry Over) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR132 (Same As) 2021-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR132 (Same As) 2021-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.