HI HR126 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging the Department of Transportation Services of the City and County of Honolulu to work in partnership with SSFM International to implement the traffic safety recommendations identified in the Kupuna Loop Sub-Area Corridor Study and to repave all roadways in the Kunia and Village Park area.
Title
Urging the Department of Transportation Services of the City and County of Honolulu to work in partnership with SSFM International to implement the traffic safety recommendations identified in the Kupuna Loop Sub-Area Corridor Study and to repave all roadways in the Kunia and Village Park area.
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2016-04-07 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4). |
2016-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1553-16), recommending adoption. |
2016-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-05 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-04-01 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:00PM in conference room 308. |
2016-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7). |
2016-03-29 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1405-16), recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-03-21 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, LoPresti, Ichiyama, Johanson, Keohokalole, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Nakashima. |
2016-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 03-21-16 10:15AM in conference room 309. |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2016-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR176 (Same As) 2016-04-08 - Referred to TRE/PSM, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=126&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HR126_.HTM |