HI HR126 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR126
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of Planning, In Coordination With Various Other Related State And County Entities, To Identify Strategies To Secure Information Regarding The Estimated Cost Of Delay In Construction Of Certain Public And Private Development Projects.
Title
Requesting The Office Of Planning, In Coordination With Various Other Related State And County Entities, To Identify Strategies To Secure Information Regarding The Estimated Cost Of Delay In Construction Of Certain Public And Private Development Projects.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-06 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR146 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325.
HR126 (Carry Over) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR126 (Carry Over) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=126&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HR126_.HTM |