HI HR126 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR126
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging All State And County Agencies To Follow The True Intent Of Chapter 201h, Hawaii Revised Statutes, And The Express Provisions Of Section 201h-38, Hawaii Revised Statutes, Rather Than Impose Additional Restrictions And Processes, To Address The Shortage Of Affordable Housing In Hawaii.
Title
Urging All State And County Agencies To Follow The True Intent Of Chapter 201h, Hawaii Revised Statutes, And The Express Provisions Of Section 201h-38, Hawaii Revised Statutes, Rather Than Impose Additional Restrictions And Processes, To Address The Shortage Of Affordable Housing In Hawaii.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2022-03-31 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Eli, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (3). |
2022-03-31 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1651-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2022-03-22 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Clark, LoPresti, McDermott. |
2022-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 03-22-22 10:00AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to HSG, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR126 (Same As) 2022-04-26 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR126 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
HR126 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).