HI HR129 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-03 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Mizuno, Thielen excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-03 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Mizuno, Thielen excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting A Review Of The State's Funding For Existing Esl Programs And Hawaiian Language Programs Offered In Hawaii And Any Disparities In Funding For The State's Two Official Languages.
Title
Review; ESL; Hawaiian Language Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Mizuno, Thielen excused (4). | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1471-12), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Belatti, Chang, Hanohano, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Takai, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Awana, Mizuno, Saiki, Wooley. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 04-02-12 2:00PM in conference room 309. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, Manahan, Wooley excused (4). | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1366-12), recommending referral to EDN. | |
2012-03-28 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, C. Lee, Belatti, Mizuno, Morikawa, Wooley, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Yamane, Ward. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 03-28-12 9:00AM in conference room 329. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Referred to HAW, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 50 | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR167 (Same As) 2012-04-03 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Mizuno, Thielen excused (4).
SCR87 (Same As) 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
SCR87 (Same As) 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.