HI HR129 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Adopt Rules To Manage Manta Ray Dive Sites.
Title
Manta Rays; Department of Land and Natural Resources; Rules
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2014-04-03 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4). |
2014-04-03 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1394-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2014-03-31 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, C. Lee, Say, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2014-03-28 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-31-14 11:00AM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-25 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Yamane excused (2). |
2014-03-25 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1252-14), recommending referral to WAL. |
2014-03-19 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, C. Lee, Lowen, Say, Nishimoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2014-03-19 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 03-19-14 9:45AM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred to OMH, WAL, referral sheet 33 |
2014-03-07 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR170 (Same As) 2014-04-21 - Resolution adopted in final form.