HI HR130 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR130
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Apologizing To The Native Hawaiian People For The Effective Prohibition In Hawaii Schools Of The Instructional Use Of The Hawaiian Language From 1896 To 1986.
Title
Apologizing To The Native Hawaiian People For The Effective Prohibition In Hawaii Schools Of The Instructional Use Of The Hawaiian Language From 1896 To 1986.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2022-03-29 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Woodson, Yamane excused (4). |
2022-03-29 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1522-22), recommending adoption. |
2022-03-24 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. |
2022-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-24-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR130 (Same As) 2022-04-08 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR130 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR130 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.