HI HR141 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The State Repair And Strongly Consider Installing Water Fountains In The State Capitol Reflecting Pools To Effectively Clean The Pools, Reduce Costs, And Enhance The Historic Value Of The Capitol District.
Title
State Capitol Reflecting Pools; Department of Accounting and General Services; Water Fountains
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-21-16 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to WAL, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2016-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR195 (Same As) 2016-03-21 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=141&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HR141_.HTM |