HI HR151 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The Department Of Transportation Establish An Air Service Task Force To Provide Recommendations For Improving Commercial Air Travel To And From Molokai And Lanai.
Title
Requesting That The Department Of Transportation Establish An Air Service Task Force To Provide Recommendations For Improving Commercial Air Travel To And From Molokai And Lanai.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-31 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2023-03-31 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kila, Poepoe, Quinlan excused (6). |
2023-03-31 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1855) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2023-03-23 | House | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Marten, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 03-23-23 10:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to TRN, referral sheet 20 |
2023-03-10 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR150 (Same As) 2023-04-28 - Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 891).