HI HR167 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR167
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Implement Sensory Rooms For Children Diagnosed With Autism Spectrum Disorder In All Schools.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Education To Implement Sensory Rooms For Children Diagnosed With Autism Spectrum Disorder In All Schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309. |
2020-03-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LHE on Monday, 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309. |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-06 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR189 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309.
HR167 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 33
HR167 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=167&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HR167_.HTM |