HI HR169 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The State To Prohibit The Introduction Of Biocontrol Agents That Might Threaten Economically Important Forage Grass Species.
Title
Urging The State To Prohibit The Introduction Of Biocontrol Agents That Might Threaten Economically Important Forage Grass Species.
Sponsors
Rep. Kirstin Kahaloa [D] | Rep. Terez Amato [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] |
Rep. Rose Martinez [D] | Rep. Jenna Takenouchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2024-03-25 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Amato voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Poepoe voting no (2) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, Woodson excused (3). |
2024-03-25 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1381-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2024-03-20 | House | The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Lowen, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2024-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-20-24 10:15AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred to AGR, referral sheet 22 |
2024-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR189 (Same As) 2024-04-16 - Resolution adopted in final form.