HI HR172 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR172
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Public Utilities Commission To Monitor Compliance With The Federal Communications Commission Mandates For The Deployment Of Backup Power Generators For Wireless Communications Providers And Collect And Publish Data On Cellular Tower Backup Capacity.
Title
Requesting The Public Utilities Commission To Monitor Compliance With The Federal Communications Commission Mandates For The Deployment Of Backup Power Generators For Wireless Communications Providers And Collect And Publish Data On Cellular Tower Backup Capacity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-03-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by IAC on Wednesday, 03-27-19 11:30AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR172 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HCR191 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HCR191 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Backup Power Source
Cellular Tower Backup Capacity
Power Resilience
Public Utilities Commission
Wireless Communications Provider
Cellular Tower Backup Capacity
Power Resilience
Public Utilities Commission
Wireless Communications Provider
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=172&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HR172_.HTM |