HI HR174 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR174
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Follow-up Study To Its 2015 Study Of Departmental Engineering Sections That Manage Capital Improvement Projects.
Title
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Follow-up Study To Its 2015 Study Of Departmental Engineering Sections That Manage Capital Improvement Projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2019-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2). |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2026), recommending adoption. |
2019-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt. |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 11:30AM in conference room 308. |
2019-03-27 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4). |
2019-03-27 | House | Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1765), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-21 | House | The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Cullen, Nakashima, Morikawa, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2019-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LMG on Thursday, 03-21-19 3:05PM in conference room 312. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR174 (Carry Over) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR193 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR193 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=174&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HR174_.HTM |