HI HR180 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing October As Women's Health Month.
Title
Women's Health Month
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2011-04-04 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Carroll, M. Oshiro, Takai, Tokioka excused. | |
2011-04-04 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1336), recommending adoption. | |
2011-03-29 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Belatti, Hanohano, Jordan, Mizuno, Wooley, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-29-11 9:00AM in conference room 329. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Referred to HLT, referral sheet 43 | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR209 (Same As) 2011-04-27 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=180 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HR180_.HTM |