HI HR3 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR3
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Hilo High School School Community Council To Recommend That The Hilo High School Gym Be Named After Albert And Lawrence Manliguis.
Title
Urging The Hilo High School School Community Council To Recommend That The Hilo High School Gym Be Named After Albert And Lawrence Manliguis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2022-04-07 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Nishimoto excused (3). |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1692-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2022-04-05 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi. |
2022-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 04-05-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-31 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4). |
2022-03-31 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1619-22), recommending referral to JHA. |
2022-03-24 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, Clark, Costales, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Quinlan, Takayama, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Ohno. |
2022-03-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 03-24-22 2:00PM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to EDN, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-28 | House | Offered |
2022-01-27 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR7 (Same As) 2022-04-25 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
HR3 (Carry Over) 2021-01-20 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR3 (Carry Over) 2021-01-20 - Resolution adopted in final form.