HI HR49 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-02 - (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Water, Land, & Ocean Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-02 - (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Water, Land, & Ocean Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Chairperson Of The Board Of Land And Natural Resources To Report To The Legislature, No Later Than December 15, 2012, On The Progress Of The Kokee State Park Advisory Council.
Title
Kokee State Park Advisory Council; Report to Legislature
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 39 | |
2012-03-01 | (H) Offered | |
2012-02-29 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR70 (Same As) 2012-03-02 - (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 39
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=49 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HR49_.HTM |