HI HR64 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on April 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-02 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on April 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-02 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The President And Congress Of The United States To Adopt The Veterans Remembered Flag.
Title
Veterans; Flag
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-02 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Souki voting no (1) and Carroll, Saiki, Wooley excused (3). | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Reported from PBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1440-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) The committees on PBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, Luke, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Souki; and 4 Excused: M. Lee, Saiki, Takai, Takumi. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by PBM on Thursday, 03-29-12 10:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2012-03-09 | (H) Referred to PBM, referral sheet 43 | |
2012-03-09 | (H) Offered | |
2012-03-08 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR92 (Same As) 2012-04-23 - (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 790) in amended form (SD 1).