HI HR75 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-13 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-13 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expressing Support For The Department Of Agriculture's Efforts To Stimulate The State's Agriculture Industry, Increase And Diversify Agricultural Output, And Promote Food Security.
Title
Agricultural Development and Food Security
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Jerry Chang [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-13 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1735-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-11-12 11:15AM in conference room 308. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Kawakami, Manahan, McKelvey, Saiki excused (5). | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1337-12), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Hashem, Awana, Brower, Choy, Evans, McKelvey, Nishimoto, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-21-12 9:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 47 | |
2012-03-13 | (H) Offered | |
2012-03-12 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR103 (Same As) 2012-04-16 - (S) Referred to AGL.
SR72 (Same As) 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
SR72 (Same As) 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.