HI HR76 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing The Issue Of Illegal Dumping Within The Waipahu Community And Urging The State, City And County Of Honolulu, And Military To Work Together To Address This Concern.
Title
Recognizing The Issue Of Illegal Dumping Within The Waipahu Community And Urging The State, City And County Of Honolulu, And Military To Work Together To Address This Concern.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2024-04-01 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Quinlan excused (2). |
2024-04-01 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1561-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2024-03-19 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-19-24 9:30AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred to WAL, referral sheet 21 |
2024-03-08 | House | Offered |
2024-03-07 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR92 (Same As) 2024-04-19 - Resolution adopted in final form.