HI HR81 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Director Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Establish A Working Group To Recommend Legislation Or Changes To Administrative Rules To Develop Contractual Obligations Between The State And Wireless Telecommunication Service Providers As To The Use Of Public Lands For Wireless Telecommunication Infrastructure.
Title
Telecommunication and Communication Providers; State Contracts; Working Group
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2014-04-03 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4). |
2014-04-03 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1410-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending adoption. |
2014-04-02 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Har. |
2014-03-31 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-02-14 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-31 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-02-14 at 2:00pm. |
2014-03-31 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-27 | House | Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-31-14 2:10PM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-25 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-31-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-25 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Yamane excused (2). |
2014-03-25 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1336-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC. |
2014-03-24 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cullen, Hanohano, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Evans, Kawakami, Say. |
2014-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-24-14 10:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-19 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai, Thielen excused (2). |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1061-14), recommending referral to WAL. |
2014-03-14 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Awana, Brower, Cachola, Ito, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wooley. |
2014-03-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 03-14-14 9:00AM in conference room 312. |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to EDB, WAL, CPC, referral sheet 32 |
2014-03-07 | House | Offered |
2014-03-06 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR110 (Same As) 2014-04-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.