HI SB1033 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends section 39-6, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to allow premiums received from the sale of general obligation bonds to be used for eligible capital expenditures pursuant to section 39-2, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Title
Public Finance
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 276). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Deferred until 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-01-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 463) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Tokuda. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-12-13 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB803 (Same As) 2013-01-24 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5