HI SB1106 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a workplace wellness pilot program. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB1106 HD1)
Title
Health; Workplace Wellness; Pilot Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1166) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Hanohano, Jordan, Mizuno, Wooley, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee. | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-22-11 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 250) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 725) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kim, Slom. | |
2011-02-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-11 10:25AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Reported from HTH/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 361) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Baker, Chun Oakland, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-11 3:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to HTH/JDL, WAM. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |