HI SB1107 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1107
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii Lottery and Gaming Corporation for the purpose of conducting and regulating wagering and gaming in the State. Establishes the Lottery and Gaming Special Fund and allocates certain percentages of the fund to various community betterment purposes.
Title
Relating To Gaming.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1107 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to JDC, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1107&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB1107_.HTM |