HI SB1116 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1116
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to LBR/CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to LBR/CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that an independent medical examination and permanent impairment rating examination shall be conducted by a qualified chiropractor or physician selected by the mutual agreement of the parties. Provides a process for appointment in the event that there is no mutual agreement.
Title
Relating To Workers' Compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to LBR/CPH, WAM. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to JDL/CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB980 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB1116 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to JDL/CPH, WAM.
SB1116 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to JDL/CPH, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1116&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB1116_.HTM |