HI SB1139 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1139
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to CPH/JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to CPH/JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an Office of Condominium Complaints and Enforcement in the Department of the Attorney General to intervene in condominium disputes. Requires Legislative Reference Bureau to study extent of condominium disputes and efficacy of the Office of Condominium Complaints and Enforcement. Appropriates money.
Title
Relating To Condominiums.
Sponsors
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/JDC, WAM. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH/JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB35 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB1139 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to CPH/JDL, WAM.
SB1139 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to CPH/JDL, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1139&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB1139_.HTM |