HI SB1188 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Act 060, 4/30/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1160).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Act 060, 4/30/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1160).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the applicable exclusion amount by adding a definition for "nonresident not citizen". Clarifies the application of estate and generation-skipping taxes for civil union couples. Makes technical, housekeeping amendments to chapter 236E, HRS, for consistency. (HD1)
Title
Estate and Generation-Skipping Transfer Tax Reform Act
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | Senate | Act 060, 4/30/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1160). |
2013-05-01 | House | Act 060, on 4/30/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1160). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 696). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Luke Chair; Nishimoto, Ward. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-16-13. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-16-13. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-13 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 614). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1449) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-03-14 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-14-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 341) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 556) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Tokuda. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-12-13 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB957 (Same As) 2013-01-24 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5