HI SB1188 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1188
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Hawaii teacher stipend program to be administered by the Department of Education to address the shortage of teachers in the Hawaii public school system. Appropriates funds for the program for 2017-2018 and 2018-2019 fiscal years. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] |
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 319) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Riviere. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 02-13-17 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-17 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1188 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Education
Education Majors
Stipend
Teacher Shortages
University of Hawaii
Department of Education
Education Majors
Stipend
Teacher Shortages
University of Hawaii