HI SB1214 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1214
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to HMS/CPH, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to HMS/CPH, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to DOH and DHS, including the office of youth services, to provide homeless outreach services. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Homelessness.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS/CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HMS/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 267) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Tokuda. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 02-08-17 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ihara, Ruderman. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-17 2:55PM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HMS/CPH, JDL/WAM. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1195 (Same As) 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
SB1214 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
SB1214 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.