HI SB1214 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1214
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Implements section 106 of the Economic Growth, Regulatory Relief, and Consumer Protection Act, P.L. 115-174, by providing one hundred twenty-day temporary transitional authority to originate loans in this State for loan originators moving from a depository institution to a non-depository institution and state-licensed loan originators moving interstate. Effective 11/24/2019. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Transitional Authority In The Mortgage Industry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 150) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB988 (Same As)
SB1214 (Carry Over) 2019-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
SB1214 (Carry Over) 2019-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Subjects
Mortgage Loan Origination
Mortgage Loan Originators
SAFE Act
Temporary License
Temporary Transitional Authority
Transitional Authority
Mortgage Loan Originators
SAFE Act
Temporary License
Temporary Transitional Authority
Transitional Authority