HI SB1214 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1214
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-03 - Re-Referred to WTL/PSM, WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-03 - Re-Referred to WTL/PSM, WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the State, and its departments and agencies, from county stormwater user fees. Prohibits county from denying services to the State or its departments and agencies by reason of nonpayment of user fees.
Title
Relating To Stormwater Fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-03 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL/PSM, WAM/JDC. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to WTL/PSM, JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1214 (Carry Over) 2021-02-03 - Re-Referred to WTL/PSM, WAM/JDC.
HB1060 (Same As) 2021-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Kapela, LoPresti, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
HB1060 (Same As) 2021-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Kapela, LoPresti, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1214&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB1214_.HTM |